McAdams et al v. Daedong Industrial Co., Ltd. d/b/a Kioti Tractor Division
Plaintiff: JO ANN MCADAMS and JAMES MCADAMS
Defendant: DAEDONG INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. d/b/a KIOTI TRACTOR DIVISION and Daedong Industrial Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02194
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief and Exhibits by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phillips, Erin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Cross-Motion for Leave to Engage in Jurisdictional Discovery filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D/Affidavit, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Phillips, Erin)
January 18, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court of Jersey County, Illinois by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Phillips, Erin)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. Discovery to be completed by 10/9/2019. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 10/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 1/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(jlm)
January 16, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly: Scheduling and Discovery Conference held on 1/16/2019. Attorneys Erin Phillips, Bradley Young, and Sarah Lukas for Plaintiffs. Attorney Scott Stephenson for Defendant. The Joint Report of Parties is approved and will be entered. Status Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 9:30 AM via telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 16, 2019 Filing 17 EXHIBIT by Daedong Industrial Co., Ltd.. Exhibit to #9 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction 2 - Supplemental Affidavit in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Stephenson, Scott)
January 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Jeane Lukas on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lukas, Sarah)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File. The defendant shall have three days to electronically file the supplemental affidavit and shall link the filing to the motion it supports. If the plaintiffs require more time to respond to the defendant's motion in light of the supplemental affidavit, they may request a reasonable extension of the response deadline. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/16/2019. (tlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Affidavit in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Daedong Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stephenson, Scott)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley C. Young on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Young, Bradley)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M. Phillips on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Phillips, Erin)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: Disputes which require a ruling on a motion made under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be handled in the following manner. The party seeking a discovery order shall request a prompt telephone conference with Judge Daly and opposing counsel by alerting the law clerk assigned to the case and providing the law clerk with appropriate material, such as: (1) a list or summary of the items in dispute, (2) copies of written requests/objections/privilege logs in dispute, and (3) an estimate of the amount of time needed to present argument to the Court. Law clerks prefer to receive these materials through Judge Daly's email depository for proposed documents. Prior to seeking a telephone conference with Judge Daly, the parties must meet and confer in an attempt to resolve the dispute informally. Argument on motions to compel discovery or for discovery sanctions shall be presented orally at the telephone conference. Written motions or legal memoranda will not be accepted unless specifically requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 12/26/2018. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 9:45 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call 888-273-3658. The access code is 1770924. The security code is 2194. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the conference call.(jlm)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Daedong Industrial Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 1/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stephenson, Scott)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/22/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 2/3/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1446, this case was removed from state court to this U.S. District Court. Section 1446(a) delineates the procedure for removing a case from state court to federal court and requires, inter alia, that the removing defendant furnish a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon such defendant. Because a jury may be demanded in a state court pleading that is not served upon the defendant(s) (e.g., an answer or a separately-filed jury demand), and this Courts civil cover sheet instructs attorneys to check the Jury Demand box only if a jury was requested in the complaint, the Court hereby DIRECTS the removing defendant(s) to file as a Supplement to Notice of Removal a copy of any state court answer or other pleading/paper which contains a jury demand OR a one-line statement that no jury was demanded by any party prior to removal. If a jury demand appears in the federal case record, no Supplement to Notice of Removal need be filed. In addition, attorneys are reminded that they must file a formal entry of appearance in this case. The removing defendant(s) shall comply with this directive within 14 days from the date of this Order. Supplement to Notice of Removal due by 1/3/2019. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/20/2018. (dmw2)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-2194-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (dmw2)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by DAEDONG INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. d/b/a KIOTI TRACTOR DIVISION of Lead Counsel Designation (Stephenson, Scott)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAEDONG INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. d/b/a KIOTI TRACTOR DIVISION. (Stephenson, Scott)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DAEDONG INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. d/b/a KIOTI TRACTOR DIVISION. (Stephenson, Scott)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Stephenson on behalf of DAEDONG INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. d/b/a KIOTI TRACTOR DIVISION (Stephenson, Scott)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jersey County, case number 18-L-21 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3750910), filed by DAEDONG INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. d/b/a KIOTI TRACTOR DIVISION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-A, #5 Exhibit D)(Stephenson, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAdams et al v. Daedong Industrial Co., Ltd. d/b/a Kioti Tractor Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAEDONG INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. d/b/a KIOTI TRACTOR DIVISION
Represented By: Scott D. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daedong Industrial Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Scott D. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JO ANN MCADAMS
Represented By: Erin M. Phillips
Represented By: Bradley C. Young
Represented By: Sarah Jeane Lukas
Represented By: Jane Unsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MCADAMS
Represented By: Erin M. Phillips
Represented By: Bradley C. Young
Represented By: Sarah Jeane Lukas
Represented By: Jane Unsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?