In Re the Seizure of: One 2018 Forester RV, $521,550.00 in US Currency, and miscellaneous property
Respondent: USA, Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration and US Marshal
Movant: Patrick N. Barber
Case Number: 3:2018mc00039
Filed: June 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: No cause code entered

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 8 Motion for Return of Property pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Sec. 983(f). Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 8/9/2018. (ceh)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re Motions to Return Property: The 1 MOTION for Return of Property pursuant to Rule 41(g) filed by Patrick N. Barber is DENIED. The 8 MOTION for Return of Property Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 983(f) filed by Patrick N. Barber will be taken under advisement after response by defendants. Defendants are DIRECTED to respond to the 8 motion for return of property on or before July 30, 2018. Petitioner may file a reply, if warranted under the Local Rules, by August 3, 2018. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 7/18/2018. (ceh)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion for the Sequestration, Preservation and Production of U.S. Currency, Police Radio Transmissions and Visual Recordings or Communication Tape(s). See Order for details. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 6/6/2018. (ceh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re the Seizure of: One 2018 Forester RV, $521,550.00 in US Currency, and miscellaneous property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Patrick N. Barber
Represented By: Stephen M. Komie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: William E. Coonan(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Justice
Represented By: William E. Coonan(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By: William E. Coonan(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Marshal
Represented By: William E. Coonan(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?