Brooks v. FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wendy Brooks
Defendant: Theodore Singleton and FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00014
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION for Leave to File its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Out of Time filed by Wendy Brooks. (Brunton, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support re #38 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Wendy Brooks. (Brunton, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 38 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Wendy Brooks. (Brunton, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Settlement statements due 10/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 6/17/2019. (arf)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery due by 1/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 3:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 3936. The Final Pretrial Conference remains set for 4/23/2020 at 1:30 p.m. and Jury Trial remains set on the May, 2020, presumptive trial month. Both settings are before Chief District Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel in East St. Louis, Illinois. (The Court modifies Paragraphs 2, 3, and 7 of the Joint Report of the Parties. See order for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of the Parties)(arf)
June 17, 2019 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/17/2019. Attorney Michael Brunton appears on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys Lillian Manning and Joseph Wientge appear on behalf of Defendant FedEx Supply Chain. Defendant Theodore Singleton appears pro se. The Joint Report of the Parties is accepted with modifications. The parties are directed to review the Court's case management procedures with regard to discovery disputes. A status conference and settlement conference will be set by further order of the Court. (Court Reporter: proceedings not recorded.) (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 4, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Out of Time by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.. (Wientge, Joseph)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2019 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference.The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. The Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 0025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/24/2019. (arf)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING #31 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/23/2019. (klh2) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 16, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Theodore Singleton. (trb)
May 16, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint by Theodore Singleton.(trb)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #21 Motion for Default Judgment as to Theodore Singleton and GRANTING #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Theodore Singleton. Singleton must respond to the Complaint on or before May 20, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/18/2019. (jmp2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The motion is denied as to Counts I and II, and the claims of punitive damages. The motion is granted as to Counts III and IV. Counts III and IV are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/18/2019. (jmp2)
April 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing: Due to pending motion for extension of time to answer filed by defendant Theodore Singleton (Doc. 26), the telephonic scheduling conference set 4/10/2019 at 9:30 a.m. is CANCELED and will be reset by further order of the Court. (arf) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 1, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Theodore Singleton. (rah)
March 27, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference RESET for 4/10/2019 at 9:30 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 4138. The parties are to submit an Amended Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order seven days before the conference. (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 27, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/27/2019. Attorney Michael Brunton appears on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys Joseph Wientge and Lillian Manning appear on behalf of Defendant FedEx Supply Chain. The Court notes there is a motion for default judgment filed against Defendant Theodore Singleton. Defendant orally moves to stay discovery pending a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8). Defendant is granted leave through 3/29/2019 to file a written motion to stay discovery. Paintiff's response shall be due 4/2/2019. The briefs are limited to 5 pages each. Due to the parties not agreeing on the proposed dates contained in the Joint Report of the Parties, the scheduling conference will be reset by further order. The parties are directed to submit an amended Joint Report of the Parties prior to the next scheduled conference. (Court Reporter: proceedings not recorded.) (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 7, 2019 Filing 23 EXHIBIT by Wendy Brooks. Exhibit to #21 Motion for Default Judgment . (Brunton, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Theodore Singleton filed by Wendy Brooks. (Brunton, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Theodore Singleton by Wendy Brooks. (Brunton, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wendy Brooks. (Brunton, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8) is now due on or before March 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/14/2019. (jmp2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wendy Brooks. (Brunton, Michael)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 2:15 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 4138. The parties are to submit a Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order seven days before the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 2/13/2019. (arf)
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Jury Trial month set for May, 2020in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(drb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re 14 Order. Entry has been modified to reflect that an Amended Track Order will be issued. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Joint Motion Change Track Status. Amended track order to be issued. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/11/2019. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 2/11/2019 (drb).
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION Change Track Status re #12 CJRA Track, by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.. (Wientge, Joseph)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 CJRA TRACK A assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 9:30 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Jury Trial month set for October, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(drb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.. (Wientge, Joseph)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lillian Theresa Talbot Manning on behalf of FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. (Manning, Lillian)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.. (Wientge, Joseph)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.. Responses due by 2/14/2019 (Wientge, Joseph)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Brunton on behalf of Wendy Brooks (Brunton, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1446, this case was removed from state court to this U.S. District Court. Section 1446(a) delineates the procedure for removing a case from state court to federal court and requires, inter alia, that the removing defendant furnish a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon such defendant. Because a jury may be demanded in a state court pleading that is not served upon the defendant(s) (e.g., an answer or a separately-filed jury demand), and this Court's civil cover sheet instructs attorneys to check the Jury Demand box only if a jury was requested in the complaint, the Court hereby DIRECTS the removing defendant(s) to file as a Supplement to Notice of Removal a copy of any state court answer or other pleading/paper which contains a jury demand OR a one-line statement that no jury was demanded by any party prior to removal. If a jury demand appears in the federal case record, no Supplement to Notice of Removal need be filed. In addition, attorneys are reminded that they must file a formal entry of appearance in this case. The removing defendant(s) shall comply with this directive within 14 days from the date of this Order. Supplement to Notice of Removal due by 1/22/2019. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/7/2019. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-14-NJR-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kek)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.. (Wientge, Joseph)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. Notice to Plaintiff of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Wientge, Joseph)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Wientge, Jr on behalf of FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. (Wientge, Joseph)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Madison Co., Illinois, case number 2018L001511 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3760350), filed by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Theodore Singleton, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Jan Wolf, #4 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiff of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wientge, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Brooks
Represented By: Michael J. Brunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Wientge, Jr.
Represented By: Lillian Theresa Talbot Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?