Bradley v. Siddiqui
Plaintiff: Deandre Bradley
Defendant: Doctor Siddiqui and Jacqueline Lashbrook
Case Number: 3:2019cv00023
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 31 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Doctor Siddiqui. (Fritz, Abbey)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deandre Bradley. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/8/2019. (anp)
February 7, 2019 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2019 re #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deandre Bradley. Motion DENIED. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Laura Esposito.) (drb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)
February 4, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Doctor Siddiqui. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fritz, Abbey)
February 4, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jacqueline Lashbrook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B)(Schwarzlose, Rachel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel D. Schwarzlose on behalf of Jacqueline Lashbrook (Schwarzlose, Rachel)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER finding as moot #22 Motion to Inform the Court. The Court will consider Plaintiff's additional allegations related to his request for injunctive relief. To the extent Plaintiff is concerned that he will not be allowed to appear at the February 7, 2019 TRO hearing, the Court has issued a writ for his appearance and he will be present by video for the hearing. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/29/2019. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/29/2019. (anp)
January 28, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Inform the Court of Very Important Information re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)
January 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Protective Order (HIPAA-Qualified) by Doctor Siddiqui. (Fritz, Abbey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbey A. Fritz on behalf of Doctor Siddiqui (Fritz, Abbey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis S. Harms on behalf of Doctor Siddiqui (Harms, Dennis)
January 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Responses due by 2/4/2019 (kls3)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deandre Bradley. The Court DIRECTS Doctor Siddiqui and Jacqueline Lashbrook to respond to the pending motion for preliminary injunction/temporary restraining order by close of business 2/4/2019. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/24/2019. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #5 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $331.17. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Menard Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/23/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 23, 2019 Filing 16 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (jaj)
January 23, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Jacqueline Lashbrook waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (tjk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Lashbrook on 1/23/2019. Waiver of Service due by 2/22/2019. (tjk)
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 VIDEO WRIT ISSUED as to Deandre Bradley #M05197 to be held February 7, 2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel presiding at East St. Louis Courthouse. (drb)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE AND ORDER: IDOC and the Warden of Menard Correctional Center shall arrange to have Deandre Bradley #M05197 present via video conference on February 7, 2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel presiding in East St. Louis Courthouse. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/23/2019. (drb)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2019 at 10:30 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. A writ will be issued for plaintiff to appear via video conference.(drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Upon further review, the Court has determined that, with respect to Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief, the Warden of Menard Correctional Center in her official capacity is the appropriate party. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to ADD Jacqueline Lashbrook (official capacity only) as a defendant in the Court's Case Management/Electronic Case Filing ("CM/ECF") system. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendant Jacqueline Lashbrook (official capacity only): (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail these forms, a copy of the Complaint, and this Memorandum and Order to Defendants place of employment. If Defendant fails to sign and return the Waiver of Service of Summons (Form 6) to the Clerk within 30 days from the date the form was sent, the Clerk shall take appropriate steps to effect formal service on Defendant, and the Court will require Defendant to pay the full costs of formal service, to the extent authorized by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FURTHER, Defendant LASHBROOK is ORDERED to timely file an appropriate responsive pleading to the Complaint and shall not waive filing a reply pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Section 1997e(g). Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/22/2019. (jcp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Doctor Siddiqui waiver sent on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (tjk)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc. #5 ), but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the inmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), the Court must review the prisoner trust fund account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 8/1/2018-9/4/2018 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at Pinckneyville Correctional Center. (Trust Fund Statement due on or before 3/4/2019). Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/17/2019. (tjk)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Siddiqui on 1/16/2019. Waiver of Service due by 2/15/2019. (tjk)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Service of Process upon Defendant Doctor Siddiqui as Counts 1 and 2 survive against him. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/15/2019. (jcp)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 19-23-NJR. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $400.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(jaj)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction Relief by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doctor Siddiqui filed by Deandre Bradley.(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandre Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Siddiqui
Represented By: Abbey A. Fritz
Represented By: Dennis S. Harms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook
Represented By: Rachel D. Schwarzlose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?