Bickett et al v. Chase Bank USA NA et al

Plaintiff: Kim Bickett Farms LLC and Kim Bickett
Defendant: Chase Bank USA NA, Chase Bankcard Services, Inc. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A
Case Number: 3:2019cv00057
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A, Chase Bankcard Services, Inc., Chase Bank USA NA. Defendants are GRANTED an extension of time, up to and including 3/29/2019, to file an answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 2/19/2019. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Chase Bank USA NA, Chase Bankcard Services, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Mangian, David)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Mangian on behalf of Chase Bank USA NA, Chase Bankcard Services, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A (Mangian, David)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Chase Bank USA NA, Chase Bankcard Services, Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (cds)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Threlkeld, Christopher)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Threlkeld, Christopher)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Threlkeld, Christopher)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-57-NJR-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (cds)
January 18, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0754-3775288 (cds)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Threlkeld on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Threlkeld, Christopher)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Hertz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hertz, Michael)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Threlkeld, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bickett et al v. Chase Bank USA NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA NA
Represented By: David Michael Mangian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bankcard Services, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Mangian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A
Represented By: David Michael Mangian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Bickett Farms LLC
Represented By: Christopher P. Threlkeld
Represented By: Michael J. Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Bickett
Represented By: Christopher P. Threlkeld
Represented By: Michael J. Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?