3D Lasers Lab LLC v. Benbow
Plaintiff: 3D Lasers Lab LLC
Defendant: Stephen P Benbow
Case Number: 3:2019cv00098
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Stephen P Benbow. Defendant Stephen P Benbow shall file his answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by April 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 3/29/2019. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint, by Stephen P Benbow. (lmb)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Stephen P Benbow. Defendant Stephen P Benbow shall file his answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by April 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 2/25/2019. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint for 30 Days, by Stephen P Benbow. (lmb)
February 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 3D Lasers Lab LLC. Stephen P Benbow served on 2/9/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Applewhite, Thomas)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Stephen P Benbow and original mailed to Attorney Applewhite. (kdb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #2 Supplement filed by 3D Lasers Lab LLC. Select the event that most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Exhibit" under the heading "Other Filings/Other Documents". Docket text modified to reflect the correct document. No further action required by the filer. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-98-SMY-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kdb)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3D Lasers Lab LLC. (Applewhite, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Applewhite on behalf of 3D Lasers Lab LLC (Applewhite, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested. (Applewhite, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT to #1 Complaint, by 3D Lasers Lab LLC Civil Cover Sheet. (Applewhite, Thomas) Modified on 2/4/2019 (kdb).
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen P Benbow ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3788426.), filed by 3D Lasers Lab LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Applewhite, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3D Lasers Lab LLC v. Benbow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3D Lasers Lab LLC
Represented By: Thomas R. Applewhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen P Benbow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?