Bauereiss v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kirby A. Bauereiss
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00157
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
0 Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
1 Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kirby A. Bauereiss. Midland Credit Management, Inc. waiver sent on 2/8/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (McCarrell, Geoff)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (cds)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-157-NJR-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent brochure)(cds)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Klain on behalf of Kirby A. Bauereiss (Klain, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoff B. McCarrell on behalf of Kirby A. Bauereiss (McCarrell, Geoff)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3794458.), filed by Kirby A. Bauereiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Credit Report, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(McCarrell, Geoff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauereiss v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby A. Bauereiss
Represented By: Geoff B. McCarrell
Represented By: David S Klain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?