Reynolds v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gregory L Reynolds
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00159
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Clifford J Proud
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Seagle on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Seagle, Catherine)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory L Reynolds. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/26/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Murray, Jr., Richard)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. (trb)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) unsealed on 2/27/2019 (trb).
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Richard D. Murray, Jr. (lmb)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-159-JPG-CJP. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(lmb)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Murray, Jr., Richard) unsealed on 2/27/2019 (trb).
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Murray, Jr. on behalf of Gregory L Reynolds (Murray, Jr., Richard)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3795520.), filed by Gregory L Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Murray, Jr., Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Represented By: Catherine A. Seagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L Reynolds
Represented By: Richard D. Murray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?