Whitworth v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Lori C Whitworth
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00221
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Reitz, Kurt)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Reitz, Kurt)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 Jury Demand and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (Counts II, III and VI) by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Reitz, Kurt)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Reitz, Kurt)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Responses due by 5/20/2019 (Reitz, Kurt)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford A. Godiner on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Godiner, Clifford)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company answer due 4/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 3/19/2019. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings) by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Reitz, Kurt)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt E. Reitz on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Reitz, Kurt)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Groves on behalf of Lori C Whitworth (Groves, Steven)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company and returned to attorney for service. (trb)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-221-SMY-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(trb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Furniss on behalf of Lori C Whitworth (Furniss, Ryan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3802941.), filed by Lori C Whitworth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Furniss, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitworth v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Clifford A. Godiner
Represented By: Kurt E. Reitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori C Whitworth
Represented By: Ryan M. Furniss
Represented By: Steven L. Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?