Lautz v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Gary Lee Lautz
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, GM FINANCIAL COMPANY, INC and GM Financial Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00244
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Gary Lee Lautz (Cohron, Travis)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary Lee Lautz. GM Financial Company, Inc. waiver sent on 3/27/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Cohron, Travis)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary Lee Lautz. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Cohron, Travis)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GM Financial Company, Inc. Original mailed to Attorney Cohron. (jlrr)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-244-SMY-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis W. Cohron on behalf of Gary Lee Lautz (Cohron, Travis)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3811602.), filed by Gary Lee Lautz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Schedule D, #4 Exhibit B - Reaff Agreement, #5 Exhibit C- EQF Disp Ltr, #6 Exhibit D - EQF RI Ltr)(Cohron, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lautz v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lee Lautz
Represented By: Travis W. Cohron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GM FINANCIAL COMPANY, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GM Financial Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?