Bradley v. Baldwin et al
Plaintiff: Deandre Bradley
Defendant: John Baldwin and Jacqueline A. Lashbrook
Case Number: 3:2019cv00259
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENT by John Baldwin, Jacqueline A. Lashbrook. Supplement to #14 Response in Opposition to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Schwarzlose, Rachel)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #29 Motion Requesting Specific Documents. Plaintiff requests a transcript of the preliminary injunction hearing in Norfleet v. Baldwin, Case No. 18-cv-1524-SMY-RJD as it also involved issues with the same shower chair that Plaintiff has been provided. The transcript in that case was not prepared. Plaintiff has also not demonstrated a need for the transcript in this case as he only offers his suspicions that the transcript will reveal inaccurate testimony from the witnesses in this case. He has not offered any evidence to suggest that their testimony in this case was false. Thus, the motion is DENIED. Should Plaintiff wish to procure a copy of the transcript, he would need to contact the court reporter for that hearing, Chris Dohack, and pay for the cost of the transcript. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/30/2019. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 29, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION Requesting Specific Documents by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)
April 25, 2019 Filing 28 Transcript of PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 4/17/2019, before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Court Reporter Molly Clayton, Telephone number 618.482.9226. NOTICE: Attorneys and unrepresented parties have 7 calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If redactions are not requested, the transcript will be made remotely available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. See the full Transcript Policy on the website at #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms/TransPolicy.pdf Transcript may be viewed at the public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2019. (mnc)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Copy. The Court DIRECTS that a transcript of the 4/17/2019 preliminary injunction hearing be prepared by the court reporter, filed with the Clerk of Court, and a copy sent to Plaintiff, at the expense of the United States. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/18/2019. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 18, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION Requesting Transcript Copies by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)
April 18, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2019 re #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Deandre Bradley. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Molly Clayton.) (drb)
April 16, 2019 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENT by Deandre Bradley. Supplement to #1 Motion for TRO. (jaj)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #22 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff requests pictures of his cell and shower area as well as medical records from August 2018 to the present. The Court does not find that pictures are necessary at this time. Further, Defendants have provided Plaintiff with relevant medical records and Plaintiff has not shown a need for the additional records that he seeks. The Court will determine at the hearing whether or not pictures and additional medical records are necessary. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/12/2019. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 11, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave and Order by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)
April 3, 2019 Filing 21 VIDEO WRIT ISSUED as to Deandre Bradley M05197 to be held April 17, 2019 at 2:30 PM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. (drb)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE AND ORDER: IDOC and the Warden of Menard Correctional Center shall arrange to have Deandre Bradley #M05197 present via video conference on April 17, 2019 at 2:30 PM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/3/2019. (drb)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Motion hearing re #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order set for 4/17/2019 at 2:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Plaintiff shall appear via video conference. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/3/2019. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #11 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $220.92. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Menard Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/28/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)
March 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Replies due by 4/5/2019, per Order at Doc. 16. (kls3)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #15 Motion Addressing the Court to take Action. Defendants filed a response to Plaintiff's motion on March 22, 2019. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of the response (Doc. 14) to Plaintiff. Plaintiff will have until April 5, 2019 to file a reply. To the extent Plaintiff's motion includes additional allegations regarding his conditions of confinement, the Court will construe the motion as a supplement to his original motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/25/2019. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION Addressing the Court to take Action by Deandre Bradley. (jsm2)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Baldwin, Jacqueline A. Lashbrook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schwarzlose, Rachel)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/22/2019. (anp)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Protective Order by John Baldwin, Jacqueline A. Lashbrook. (Schwarzlose, Rachel)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deandre Bradley. (kls3)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel D. Schwarzlose on behalf of John Baldwin, Jacqueline A. Lashbrook (Schwarzlose, Rachel)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT by Deandre Bradley. Supplement to #1 Motion for TRO. (jsm2)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Baldwin.(tjk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Defendant Lashbrook. (tjk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Lashbrook on 3/6/2019. Waiver of Service due by 4/5/2019. (tjk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Baldwin on 3/6/2019. Waiver of Service due by 4/5/2019. (tjk)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Service of Process upon John Baldwin and Jacqueline Lashbrook. Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order is DENIED. Defendants are DIRECTED to respond to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction by March 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/6/2019. (anp)
March 6, 2019 Set Deadlines: Answers due by 5/6/2019. (tjk)
March 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 3/22/2019. (kls3)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 19-259-NJR. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $400.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(tjk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from USDC/SDIL to Plaintiff informing him of case number and filing fee requirements. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed IFP, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (jaj)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION (COMPLAINT) for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Deandre Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Remporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Relief)(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Baldwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandre Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baldwin
Represented By: Rachel D. Schwarzlose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline A. Lashbrook
Represented By: Rachel D. Schwarzlose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?