Kruger v. Baldwin et al
Plaintiff: Joshua W. Kruger
Defendant: John R. Baldwin, John Doe #11, Jacqueline Lashbrook, John Doe #5, John Doe #4, Stephen Keim, Howard Harner, John Doe #7, John Doe #8, Eldon Kennell, John Doe #6, Kimberly Butler, John Doe #9 and John Doe #10
Case Number: 3:2019cv00268
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 40.00 received, receipt number 34625092250 (cds)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Now that Plaintiff has opted to proceed with this action (Doc. #6 ), the Court will review the complaint to identify claims and defendants and to dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See 28 U.S.C. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days. The Court will then inform Plaintiff of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in the case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, Plaintiff need not submit any evidence, argument, motions, or documents. If Plaintiff does not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, he may file a motion requesting the status of the case. The Court will not consider a status motion at any time prior to the 60-day deadline. If Plaintiff has filed a motion for recruitment of counsel, it will not be considered until the complaint is reviewed. In addition, any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of Plaintiff's own efforts to find counsel such as a list of attorneys contacted and copies of letters sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If Plaintiff's claim(s) survive the merit review, the Court will send a Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service Form to the appropriate defendant(s). This will be the first time the defendant(s) will be informed of the lawsuit. After a defendant signs the waiver and returns it, that defendant will then have 60 days to file an answer to the complaint. If a defendant does not return the completed waiver, the Court will follow up as necessary to complete service on that defendant. When all of the defendants have filed answers, the Court will enter a Scheduling Order containing important information on deadlines, discovery, and procedures. All requests for file-stamped copies of documents must be accompanied by a stamped, self-addressed envelope and an extra copy of the document to be filed-stamped and returned. The Clerk cannot photocopy documents for Plaintiff unless the copy fee of $0.50 per page is submitted in advance. Finally, Plaintiff must promptly notify the court in writing of any change of address. Failure to notify the court of a change in address could result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/28/2019. (tjk)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff has opted to proceed with this action (Doc. #6 ) and is obligated to pay the $350.00 filing fee. Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis based on his application in the original case, 18-cv-512-NJR-RJD. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), and based on Plaintiffs previously submitted trust fund records for the six months immediately prior to the date the original case was filed, Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $36.66. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at Pontiac Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/28/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed Further by Joshua W. Kruger. (jsm2)
March 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Action due by 4/10/2019. (jsm2)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: On 3/5/2019, this case was severed from Kruger v. Lashbrook, et al, SDIL Case No. 18-cv-512-NJR-RJD. Plaintiff should be aware of the consequences of proceeding with this action. First, the Court will screen the action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A, and Plaintiff will incur a strike within the meaning of section 1915(g) if the Court determines that the action is frivolous or malicious, fails to state a claim on which relief may be granted, or seeks monetary relief against a defendant who is immune from such relief. Second, Plaintiff will be required to pay an additional $350.00 filing fee in this case. Of course, Plaintiff can also opt not to proceed with this action by voluntarily dismissing it, thereby avoiding the risk of a strike and the financial burden of an additional filing fee. Plaintiff should carefully consider these points, along with the merits and relative importance of this lawsuit, in deciding whether to proceed with it. Plaintiff shall have until April 10, 2019 to advise the Court in writing whether he wishes to proceed with this lawsuit. If he chooses to go forward, the Court will assess an initial partial filing fee (if appropriate) and screen the complaint. On the other hand, if Plaintiff opts to voluntarily dismiss the case by the deadline, he will not have to pay a filing fee, the Court will not screen the complaint, and the case will be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is WARNED that if he fails to respond to this Order by the deadline, he will be obligated to pay the full filing fee and this action will be dismissed for want of prosecution and/or for failure to comply with a court order. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/6/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Joshua W. Kruger. (tjk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua W. Kruger. (tjk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joshua W. Kruger.(tjk)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER severing case number 18-512-NJR-RJD. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/5/2019. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kruger v. Baldwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Keim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Harner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldon Kennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua W. Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?