Brown v. ITS Solar, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John M. Brown
Defendant: Richard C. Schmidt, Jr. and ITS Solar, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00320
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 90 DAY ORDER: The undersigned District Judge has been advised by the parties that the above-captioned action is settled in its entirety, but the parties need additional time to finalize the settlement documents. Accordingly, the undersigned District Judge DIRECTS the Clerk of Court, 90 days after this Order is docketed, to ENTER JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, unless otherwise provided in the settlement documents. If the parties fail to finalize the settlement within the 90-day period, they may -- before that period expires -- move to postpone entry of judgment to a later date. Responses due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/24/2019. (bak)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by All Defendants (Brown, Mark)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L. Brown on behalf of All Defendants (Brown, Mark)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ITS Solar, LLC, Richard C. Schmidt, Jr, filed by John M. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (In-Land Tech, Service Agreement), #2 Exhibit xhibit 2 (Interim Sales Agreement), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (4.27.18 Lindsay Romero email), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (5.8.18 Lindsay Romero email))(Wolf, Ferne)
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John M. Brown. ITS Solar, LLC served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Wolf, Ferne)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John M. Brown. Richard C. Schmidt, Jr served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Wolf, Ferne)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTION: This matter is before the Court sua sponte on the issue of federal subject matter jurisdiction. See Foster v. Hill, 497 F.3d 695, 696-97 (7th Cir. 2007) ("It is the responsibility of a court to make an independent evaluation of whether subject matter jurisdiction exists in every case."). The law of this Circuit plainly provides that if a party is an LLC, its citizenship depends on the citizenship of each of its members. See, e.g., Copeland v. Penske Logistics, LLC, 675 F.3d 1040, 1043 (7th Cir. 2012) ("a limited liability company's citizenship includes every state of which any unit holder is a citizen"). The Complaint does not disclose the list of each member of Defendant ITS Solar, LLC and his/her/its citizenship. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint no later than April 17, 2019 which clearly sets forth all information needed to determine whether jurisdiction lies in this Court. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/17/2019). Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/20/2019. (bak)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Richard C. Schmidt, Jr. Original sent to Plaintiff for service (amv)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ITS Solar, LLC. (amv)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-320-NJR-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
March 18, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0754-3830085 (amv)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill A. Silverstein on behalf of John M. Brown (Silverstein, Jill)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Pierson on behalf of John M. Brown (Pierson, Joshua)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ferne P. Wolf on behalf of John M. Brown (Wolf, Ferne)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ITS Solar, LLC, Richard C. Schmidt, Jr, filed by John M. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (In-Land Tech, Service Agreement), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Interim Sales Agreement), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (4.27.18 Lindsay Romero email), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (5.8.18 Lindsay Romero email), #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons ITS Solar, LLC Summons, #7 Summons Richard C. Schmidt, Jr. Summons)(Wolf, Ferne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. ITS Solar, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Schmidt, Jr.
Represented By: Mark L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITS Solar, LLC
Represented By: Mark L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Brown
Represented By: Jill A. Silverstein
Represented By: Ferne P. Wolf
Represented By: Joshua M. Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?