Poshard v. Madison County, Illinois et al

Plaintiff: Kristen Poshard
Defendant: Douglas Hulme, Philip Chapman, Madison County, Illinois and Kurtis Prenzler
Case Number: 3:2019cv00324
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 31 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2020 at 1:30 PM and Jury Trial set for 12/14/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(slh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint and affirmative defenses, by Philip Chapman.(Wagner, Michael) Modified on 6/18/2019 (amv).
June 7, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint, and affirmative defenses by Kurtis Prenzler.(Schott, David)
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 Defendant Douglas Hulme's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint, by Douglas Hulme.(Bailey, T.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Christopher Bailey on behalf of Douglas Hulme (Bailey, T.)
June 7, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Ritter on behalf of Douglas Hulme (Ritter, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Tori L. Walls on behalf of Kurtis Prenzler (Walls, Tori)
June 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Schott on behalf of Kurtis Prenzler (Schott, David)
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint, and Defenses by Madison County, Illinois.(Gilbert, John)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Chapman's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended through June 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 6/7/19. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 7, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Amended Complaint, by Philip Chapman. (Wagner, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended through June 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 5/21/2019. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 16, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Amended Complaint, by Douglas Hulme, Madison County, Illinois, Kurtis Prenzler. (Swick, Christi)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court ALLOWS defendant Chapman up to and including May 22, 2019 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 4/25/2019. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Amended Complaint, by Philip Chapman. (Wagner, Michael)
April 22, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kristen Poshard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge, #2 Exhibit Charge, #3 Exhibit DoJ RTS, #4 Exhibit EEOC RTS, #5 Exhibit IDHR Rt to Commence, #6 Exhibit IDHR Rt to Commence)(Wolf, Ferne)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond on or before May 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 4/22/2019. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Wagner on behalf of Philip Chapman (Wagner, Michael)
April 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, by Douglas Hulme, Madison County, Illinois, Kurtis Prenzler. (Swick, Christi)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Gilbert on behalf of Douglas Hulme, Madison County, Illinois, Kurtis Prenzler (Gilbert, John)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J. Lading on behalf of Douglas Hulme, Madison County, Illinois, Kurtis Prenzler (Lading, Philip)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christi L. Swick on behalf of Douglas Hulme, Madison County, Illinois, Kurtis Prenzler (Swick, Christi)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristen Poshard. Kurtis Prenzler served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Wolf, Ferne)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristen Poshard. Douglas Hulme served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Wolf, Ferne)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristen Poshard. Madison County, Illinois served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Wolf, Ferne)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Philip Chapman, Douglas Hulme, Madison County, Illinois, Kurtis Prenzler. Original mailed to counsel for service. (amv)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-324-SMY-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill A. Silverstein on behalf of Kristen Poshard (Silverstein, Jill)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Pierson on behalf of Kristen Poshard (Pierson, Joshua)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ferne P. Wolf on behalf of Kristen Poshard (Wolf, Ferne)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philip Chapman, Douglas Hulme, Madison County, Illinois, Kurtis Prenzler ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3831762.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (10.20.17 Charge 560-2018-00128), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (1.16.18 Charge 560-2018-00956), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (DOJ 12.21.18 Right to Sue Notice), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (EEOC 3.14.19 Right to Sue Notice), #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Madison County, Illinois Summons, #7 Summons P. Chapman Summons, #8 Summons K. Prenzler Summons, #9 Summons D. Hulme Summons)(Wolf, Ferne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poshard v. Madison County, Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Hulme
Represented By: T. Christopher Bailey
Represented By: Christi L. Swick
Represented By: Philip J. Lading
Represented By: John L. Gilbert
Represented By: Daniel R. Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Chapman
Represented By: Michael L. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County, Illinois
Represented By: Christi L. Swick
Represented By: Philip J. Lading
Represented By: John L. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurtis Prenzler
Represented By: Christi L. Swick
Represented By: Philip J. Lading
Represented By: John L. Gilbert
Represented By: Tori L. Walls
Represented By: David A. Schott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Poshard
Represented By: Jill A. Silverstein
Represented By: Ferne P. Wolf
Represented By: Joshua M. Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?