Foster v. McEwen, individually et al
Plaintiff: Debbie Foster
Defendant: McEwen Law Firm, Ltd. and Gregory McEwen, individually
Case Number: 3:2019cv00361
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Debbie Foster.(Rogers, Kevin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Phil Gilbert: Motion Hearing held on 6/27/2019. The Court is hereby Granting in part and Denying in part #11 Motion for Relief and Extension of Time. The caption of this case remains Foster v. McEwen, et al., and the Plaintiff has 10 days to file an amended complaint. Defense Counsel makes an oral motion to change the trial track of this case. Plaintiff having no objection, the Court hereby Grants the oral motion and reassigns this case to a Track C. The Final Pretrial Conference is Reset for 9/23/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 10/5/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe.) (tag)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Settlement statements due on or before 9/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 5/28/2019. (dmw2)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery due by 1/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(dmw2)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/28/2019. Attorney Kevin Rogers present on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Todd Lubben present on behalf of Defendants. The Joint Report of the Parties will be adopted. Should the parties seek to amend the trial date, a written motion will be required. The parties were reminded of the option of consenting to the magistrate judge. A Settlement Conference is set for 9/24/2019 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. (dmw2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of HEARING regarding #11 MOTION for Relief from Order and Extension of Time to File Federal Pleadings. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are directed to appear in person. (tag)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #12 Notice (Other) filed by Debbie Foster. The document attached contains a Notice of Filing. Notices of Filing and Certificates of Service should only be filed as the final page of a pleading, and not a standalone document. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Debbie Foster re #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, 4 Order Regarding Supplement to Notice of Removal and Entry of Appearance,,,,, OF FILING (Rogers, Kevin)
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, 4 Order Regarding Supplement to Notice of Removal and Entry of Appearance,,,,, by Debbie Foster. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0361. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 4/26/2019. (dmw2)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/29/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 5/11/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by McEwen Law Firm, Ltd., Gregory McEwen, individually executed by State Court (Lubben, Todd)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory McEwen, individually, McEwen Law Firm, Ltd..The case number is missing from the pleading. Please be sure to place the case number 19-361-JPG, on all documents filed in this case. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. No further action required by the filer. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by A. J. Bronsky on behalf of McEwen Law Firm, Ltd., Gregory McEwen, individually (Bronsky, A.)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of McEwen Law Firm, Ltd., Gregory McEwen, individually (Lubben, Todd)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1446, this case was removed from state court to this U.S. District Court. Section 1446(a) delineates the procedure for removing a case from state court to federal court and requires, inter alia, that the removing defendant furnish a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon such defendant. Because a jury may be demanded in a state court pleading that is not served upon the defendant(s) (e.g., an answer or a separately-filed jury demand), and this Courts civil cover sheet instructs attorneys to check the Jury Demand box only if a jury was requested in the complaint, the Court hereby DIRECTS the removing defendant(s) to file as a Supplement to Notice of Removal a copy of any state court answer or other pleading/paper which contains a jury demand OR a one-line statement that no jury was demanded by any party prior to removal. If a jury demand appears in the federal case record, no Supplement to Notice of Removal need be filed. In addition, attorneys are reminded that they must file a formal entry of appearance in this case. The removing defendant(s) shall comply with this directive within 14 days from the date of this Order. Supplement to Notice of Removal due by 4/15/2019(cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-361-JPG-GSC. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 consent brochure)(cds)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McEwen Law Firm, Ltd.. (Lubben, Todd)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair, case number 17-L-250 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3842013), filed by McEwen Law Firm, Ltd., Gregory McEwen, individually. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit B)(Lubben, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. McEwen, individually et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Foster
Represented By: Kevin B. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McEwen Law Firm, Ltd.
Represented By: Todd A. Lubben
Represented By: A. J. Bronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory McEwen, individually
Represented By: Todd A. Lubben
Represented By: A. J. Bronsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?