Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Ehret Inc.
Plaintiff: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund and Employers & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund
Defendant: Ehret Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00364
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #18 Affidavit filed by Employers & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund, Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund. See Rule 26.1(b) Filing of Disclosure and Discovery. Interrogatories under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 33 and the answers thereto, requests for production or inspection under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 34, and depositions under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 30 and 31 shall be served upon other counsel or parties but shall not be filed with the court. This includes notice of service of discovery documents. The party responsible for service of the discovery material shall retain the original and become the custodian thereof. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 STRICKEN AFFIDAVIT of Service by All Plaintiffs. (Kimmey, James) Modified on 7/12/2019 (amv).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, GRANTING #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan M. Kaemmerer. $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3898372 filed by Ehret Inc.. Signed by Unassigned on 6/5/2019. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan M. Kaemmerer $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3898372 by on behalf of Ehret Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery due by 2/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/23/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 3:00 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 3339. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of the Parties)(arf)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/4/2019. Attorney Jacob Blickhan appears on behalf of Plaintiffs. Attorneys Andrew Lammert and Brian Kammerer appear on behalf of Defendant. Attorney Kammerer is directed to file an entry of appearance. The Joint Report of the Parties is accepted as submitted. A status conference will be set by further order of the Court. (Court Reporter: proceedings not recorded.) (arf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A. Blickhan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blickhan, Jacob)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 10:45 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days prior to the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 2198. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 4/26/2019. (arf)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Bench Trial set for 6/23/2020 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. (arf)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Ehret Inc..(Lammert, Andrew)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER upon consent of parties, this case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/15/2019. (amv)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 Final CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Lammert, Andrew) Unsealed on 4/12/2019 (amv).
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Lammert on behalf of Ehret Inc. (Lammert, Andrew)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Ehret Inc. served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Kimmey, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kimmey, James) Unsealed on 4/12/2019 (amv).
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ehret Inc.. (amv)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-364-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3843063.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kimmey, James)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Kimmey, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kimmey, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Ehret Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: James R. Kimmey, III
Represented By: Jacob A. Blickhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund
Represented By: James R. Kimmey, III
Represented By: Jacob A. Blickhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ehret Inc.
Represented By: Bryan M. Kaemmerer
Represented By: Andrew M. Lammert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?