Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Rock Solid Paving & Excavating, Inc.
Plaintiff: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund and Employer & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund
Defendant: Rock Solid Paving & Excavating, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00366
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Employer & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund, Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund against Rock Solid Paving & Excavating, Inc. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/18/2019. (jdh)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, granting #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Rock Solid Paving & Excavating, Inc. filed by Employer & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund, Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/18/2019. (jdh)
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Rock Solid Paving & Excavating, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit James R. Kimmey, #2 Affidavit Attorneys Fees and Costs, #3 Exhibit)(Kimmey, James)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #8 Clerk's Entry of Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kimmey, James)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #7 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Employer & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund, Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund. Defendant's name within the caption of the document is incorrect, however the remainder of the document references the correct defendant. Therefore, Clerk's Entry of Default entered. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rock Solid Paving & Excavating, Inc.(cjo)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Rock Solid Paving and Excavating, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kimmey, James)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Rock Solid Paving & Excavating, Inc. served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Kimmey, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kimmey, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rock Solid Paving & Excavating, Inc.. (cjo)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-366-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(cjo)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3843180.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Kimmey, James)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Kimmey, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kimmey, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Rock Solid Paving & Excavating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: James R. Kimmey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employer & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund
Represented By: James R. Kimmey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Solid Paving & Excavating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?