Walsh v. Officer Justin Kempfer et al

Plaintiff: Kody Walsh
Defendant: Officer John Powell, Officer Christopher Roth, Officer Sean A. Starkweather, John Doe Correctional Officers, Sgt. Tyler Jones, Officer Joshua Meade, Officer Justin Kempfer, Officer John Carawa, Officer Bradley Warhausen, Officer Dane T. Walls, Internal Affairs Officer Lance Phelps, Officer Wesley Cowan, Officer Dudzinski, Frank Lawrence, Justin Kempfer, Lance Phelps, Wesley Cowan, John Carawa, Joshua Meade, John Does, Bradley Warhausen, John Powell, Dane T Walls, Tyler Jones, Christopher Roth, Dudzinski and Sean A Starkweather
Case Number: 3:2019cv00384
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Protective Order by John Carawa, Wesley Cowan, Dudzinski, Tyler Jones, Justin Kempfer, Frank Lawrence, Joshua Meade, Lance Phelps, John Powell, Christopher Roth, Sean A Starkweather, Dane T Walls, Bradley Warhausen. (White, Ashley)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by John Carawa, Wesley Cowan, Dudzinski, Tyler Jones, Justin Kempfer, Frank Lawrence, Joshua Meade, Lance Phelps, John Powell, Christopher Roth, Sean A Starkweather, Dane T Walls, Bradley Warhausen. (White, Ashley)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Defendants' Motion for HIPAA Protective Order (Doc. #10 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 7/1/2019. (bps)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Protective Order by John Carawa, Wesley Cowan, Dudzinski, Tyler Jones, Justin Kempfer, Frank Lawrence, Joshua Meade, Lance Phelps, John Powell, Christopher Roth, Sean A Starkweather, Dane T Walls, Bradley Warhausen. (White, Ashley)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. John Carawa waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Wesley Cowan waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Dudzinski waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Tyler Jones waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Justin Kempfer waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Frank Lawrence waiver sent on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; Joshua Meade waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Lance Phelps waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; John Powell waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Christopher Roth waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Sean A Starkweather waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Dane T Walls waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019; Bradley Warhausen waiver sent on 5/6/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Kulis, Gregory)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Simone White on behalf of John Carawa, Wesley Cowan, Dudzinski, Tyler Jones, Justin Kempfer, Frank Lawrence, Joshua Meade, Lance Phelps, John Powell, Christopher Roth, Sean A Starkweather, Dane T Walls, Bradley Warhausen (White, Ashley)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court's recent Order (Doc. #6 ) inadvertently included a provision for service of process on the Defendants by the Clerk of the Court. As Plaintiff is not a pro se litigant, has not filed for in Pauperis status and has not filed a Motion for Service at Government Expense, Plaintiff is responsible for service of process under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. Accordingly, the Court STRIKES the portion of the Order directing the Clerk of the Court to complete service of process on Plaintiff's behalf and amends the Order to provide that Plaintiff is responsible for service of process on the Defendants.. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/9/2019. (bps)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to ADD FRANK LAWRENCE, ACTING WARDEN OF MENARD CORRECTIONAL CENTER (official capacity only) as a Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendants JUSTIN KEMPFER, DUDZINSKI, BRADLEY WARHAUSEN, DANE T WALLS, JOHN POWELL, CHRISTOPHER ROTH, JOHN CARAWA, JOSHUA MEADE, WESLEY COWAN, SEAN A. STARKWEATHER, TYLER JONES, LANCE PHELPS, FRANK LAWRENCE and, once identified, JOHN DOES: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons), and (2) Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail these forms, a copy of the Complaint, and this Memorandum and Order to each Defendants place of employment as identified by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/7/2019. (bps)
April 8, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle. (jaj)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION - Case reassigned this date as it will proceed under prisoner case review. No Magistrate is assigned at this time. The Case number for future pleadings is: 19-384-SMY. Once a preliminary review is completed, service instructions will follow. No further action by filer is due at this time. (jaj)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-384-SMY-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory E. Kulis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kulis, Gregory)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Orozco on behalf of Kody Walsh (Orozco, Brian)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3848866.), filed by Kody Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Lien, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orozco, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Officer Justin Kempfer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Christopher Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Sean A. Starkweather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Tyler Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Joshua Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Justin Kempfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Carawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bradley Warhausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Dane T. Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Affairs Officer Lance Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Wesley Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Dudzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Lawrence
Represented By: Ashley Simone White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Kempfer
Represented By: Ashley Simone White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Phelps
Represented By: Ashley Simone White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Cowan
Represented By: Ashley Simone White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carawa
Represented By: Ashley Simone White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Meade
Represented By: Ashley Simone White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Warhausen
Represented By: Ashley Simone White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Powell
Represented By: Ashley Simone White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane T Walls
Represented By: Ashley Simone White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Jones
Represented By: Ashley Simone White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Roth
Represented By: Ashley Simone White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dudzinski
Represented By: Ashley Simone White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean A Starkweather
Represented By: Ashley Simone White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kody Walsh
Represented By: Brian M. Orozco
Represented By: Gregory E. Kulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?