Smith v. American Water Resources of Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Defendant: Memphis Light, Gas, and Water and American Water Resources of Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2019cv00388
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in Western District of Tennessee as case 2:19-cv-02275, filed 04/30/2019. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred to the Western District of Tennessee. (kdb)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Western District of Tennessee. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/29/2019. (jdh)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (rah)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense by Charmane Smith. (rah)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #4 by Charmane Smith. (rah)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/26/2019. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/9/2019. (jdh)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charmane Smith. (rah)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against American Water Resources of Tennessee, and Memphis Light, Gas, and Water, filed by Charmane Smith.(rah)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-388-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Brochure)(rah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. American Water Resources of Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memphis Light, Gas, and Water
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Water Resources of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?