Tri-Township Water District v. Trenton
Plaintiff: Tri-Township Water District
Defendant: City of Trenton and City of Trenton, Illinois
Case Number: 3:2019cv00414
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Tri-Township Water District. (Gilbert, John)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by City of Trenton, Illinois. (Paulson, Alvin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim FRCP 12(b)(6) by City of Trenton, Illinois. Responses due by 6/27/2019 (Paulson, Alvin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alvin C. Paulson on behalf of City of Trenton, Illinois (Paulson, Alvin)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Trenton, Illinois. City of Trenton, Illinois waiver sent on 4/12/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Paulson, Alvin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-414-SMY-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Gilbert on behalf of Tri-Township Water District (Gilbert, John)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against City of Trenton ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3855315.), filed by Tri-Township Water District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gilbert, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tri-Township Water District v. Trenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-Township Water District
Represented By: John L. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Trenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Trenton, Illinois
Represented By: Alvin C. Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?