Osborne v. Meyers et al.

Plaintiff: Phillip Edward Osborne and Phillip Osborne
Defendant: Shawn Meyers, Pulaski County, Alexander County, Alexander County, Illinois and Pulaski County, Illinois
Case Number: 3:2019cv00426
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or other Responsive Pleading filed by Shawn Meyers, and #18 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Alexander County, Illinois, Pulaski County, Illinois. Defendants are GRANTED an extension of time, up to and including 7/15/2019, to file their answers or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 6/25/2019. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Alexander County, Illinois, Pulaski County, Illinois. (Radia, Bhairav)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or other Responsive Pleading by Shawn Meyers. (Grady, Dylan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan P. Grady on behalf of Shawn Meyers (Grady, Dylan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Funk on behalf of Alexander County, Illinois, Pulaski County, Illinois (Funk, Brian)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Bhairav Radia on behalf of Alexander County, Illinois, Pulaski County, Illinois (Radia, Bhairav)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Osborne. Pulaski County, Illinois served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Dunham, Darrell)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Osborne. Alexander County, Illinois served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Dunham, Darrell)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Osborne. Shawn Meyers served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Dunham, Darrell)
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Pulaski County, Illinois. Original mailed to Plaintiff for Service (amv)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Alexander County, Illinois. Original mailed to Plaintiff for service. (amv)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Requested. (Dunham, Darrell)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Dunham, Darrell)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Shawn Meyers. (cds)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Dunham, Darrell)
April 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly added. (tjk)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case be assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge for disposition of non-dispositive pretrial matters pursuant to Local Rule 72.1(a)(1) and 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1)(A). The assigned Magistrate Judge shall hold a scheduling and discovery conference as soon as practicable to facilitate the entry of appropriate scheduling and/or discovery orders. Further, this entire matter shall be REFERRED to a United States Magistrate Judge for disposition, pursuant to Local Rule 72.2(b)(3) and 28 U.S.C. 636(c), if all parties consent to such a referral. Plaintiff's counsel shall be responsible for service. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/22/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-426-SMY. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (cjo)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell W. Dunham on behalf of Phillip Edward Osborne (Dunham, Darrell)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by Phillip Osborne against Shawn Meyers, Alexander County, Pulaski County ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3858176.), filed by Phillip Edward Osborne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Record of Surveillance, #3 Exhibit Probable Cause, #4 Exhibit Arrest Warrant)(Dunham, Darrell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborne v. Meyers et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Edward Osborne
Represented By: Darrell W. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Osborne
Represented By: Darrell W. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Meyers
Represented By: Dylan P. Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander County, Illinois
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County, Illinois
Represented By: Brian M Funk
Represented By: Bhairav Radia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?