Walker v. Butler et al

Plaintiff: James E Walker
Defendant: John R. Baldwin, A Johnson, Officer Ellis, Salvador Godinez, Y Joseph, Kim Butler, Kay Allsup, Richard Harrington, Dana, Tonya Knust, Brad Bramlet, Betsy Spiller and Vicki Payne
Case Number: 3:2019cv00445
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Now that Plaintiff has opted to proceed with this action, the Court will review the complaint to identify claims and defendants and to dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See 28 U.S.C. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days. The Court will then inform Plaintiff of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in the case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, Plaintiff need not submit any evidence, argument, motions, or documents. If Plaintiff does not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, he may file a motion requesting the status of the case. The Court will not consider a status motion at any time prior to the 60-day deadline. If Plaintiff has filed a motion for recruitment of counsel, it will not be considered until the complaint is reviewed. In addition, any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of Plaintiff's own efforts to find counsel such as a list of attorneys contacted and copies of letters sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If Plaintiff's claim(s) survive the merit review, the Court will send a Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service Form to the appropriate defendant(s). This will be the first time the defendant(s) will be informed of the lawsuit. After a defendant signs the waiver and returns it, that defendant will then have 60 days to file an answer to the complaint. If a defendant does not return the completed waiver, the Court will follow up as necessary to complete service on that defendant. When all of the defendants have filed answers, the Court will enter a Scheduling Order containing important information on deadlines, discovery, and procedures. All requests for file-stamped copies of documents must be accompanied by a stamped, self-addressed envelope and an extra copy of the document to be filed-stamped and returned. The Clerk cannot photocopy documents for Plaintiff unless the copy fee of $0.50 per page is submitted in advance. Finally, Plaintiff must promptly notify the court in writing of any change of address. Failure to notify the court of a change in address could result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/17/2019. (tjk)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff has opted to proceed with this action and is obligated to pay the $350.00 filing fee. Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis based on his application in the original case, 15-cv-786-MAB. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), and based on Plaintiff's previously submitted trust fund records for the six months immediately prior to the date the original case was filed, Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $0.51. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at Lawrence Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/17/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #5 Response filed by James E Walker. Clerk has modified to correct filing date of 5/14/19. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to 4 Order filed by James E Walker. (jsm2) Modified on 5/15/2019 (jsm2).
April 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Action due by 5/30/2019. (jaj)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: On 4/23/2019, this case was severed from Walker v. Unknown Party, et al, SDIL Case No. 15-cv-786-MAB. Plaintiff should be aware of the consequences of proceeding with this action. First, the Court will screen the action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A, and Plaintiff will incur a strike within the meaning of section 1915(g) if the Court determines that the action is frivolous or malicious, fails to state a claim on which relief may be granted, or seeks monetary relief against a defendant who is immune from such relief. Second, Plaintiff will be required to pay an additional $350.00 filing fee in this case. Of course, Plaintiff can also opt not to proceed with this action by voluntarily dismissing it, thereby avoiding the risk of a strike and the financial burden of an additional filing fee. Plaintiff should carefully consider these points, along with the merits and relative importance of this lawsuit, in deciding whether to proceed with it. Plaintiff shall have until May 30, 2019 to advise the Court in writing whether he wishes to proceed with this lawsuit. If he chooses to go forward, the Court will assess an initial partial filing fee (if appropriate) and screen the complaint. On the other hand, if Plaintiff opts to voluntarily dismiss the case by the deadline, he will not have to pay a filing fee, the Court will not screen the complaint, and the case will be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is WARNED that if he fails to respond to this Order by the deadline, he will be obligated to pay the full filing fee and this action will be dismissed for want of prosecution and/or for failure to comply with a court order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/25/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James E Walker. (cjo)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by James E Walker.(cjo)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Memorandum and Order Severing case number 15-786-MAB signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 4/23/2019. (cjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador Godinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Allsup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Knust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Bramlet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Spiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?