Kalina et al v. USA
Plaintiff: Melissa Kalina and Scott Kalina
Defendant: United States of America and USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00492
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. USA served on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Keefe, Thomas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Keefe, Thomas)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America. Original mailed to Attorney Thomas Q. Keefe III (lmb)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-492-SMY-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(lmb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Q. Keefe, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Keefe, Thomas)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3877570.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Affidavit and COM, #2 Summons Summons - USA, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Keefe, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalina et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Kalina
Represented By: Thomas Q. Keefe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Kalina
Represented By: Thomas Q. Keefe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?