Star Design International Inc. v. Jacobo, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Star Design International Inc.
Defendant: Sandro Y. Nijmeh, Pali 1948 LLC, d/b/a POP'S #3, E & Mackeen Grocery, Inc., d/b/a POP'S #5, Hussein J. Nijmeh, Hasuon, Inc., d/b/a POP'S #2, Mohammad N. Farah, Jacobo, Inc., d/b/a Pop's Convenience Store or POP'S #1, Banduk Inc., d/b/a POP'S #4, Jacobo Inc., Hasuon, Inc., Pali 1948 LLC, Banduk Inc. and E & Mackeen Grocery, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00518
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 52 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint CONSENTED by All Defendants. (Howard, David)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading is now due on or before July 12, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 7/1/2019. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 28, 2019 Filing 50 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint SECOND MOTION by All Defendants. (Howard, David)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading is now due on or before June 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 6/17/2019. (klh2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 17, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #43 and #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Hasuon, Inc., Sandro Y. Nijmeh, E & Mackeen Grocery, Inc., Banduk Inc., Jacobo Inc., Hussein J. Nijmeh, Pali 1948 LLC, Mohammad N. Farah. Other: the Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice are fillable documents. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Howard on behalf of all defendants. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Muller on behalf of all defendants. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 14, 2019 Filing 45 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Howard, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David L. Howard $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3905854 by on behalf of All Defendants. (Howard, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J. Joseph Muller $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3905850 by on behalf of All Defendants. (Muller, J.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE by Star Design International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wunderlich, Sandra)
June 6, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking 39 Order, Terminate Motions. Order inadvertently omitted from entry. Order refiled at doc. 40. with document attached. (dkd)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER MODIFYING Seizure Order and GRANTING Star Design's request for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/6/2019. (dkd)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Entry Stricken: ORDER MODIFYING Seizure Order and GRANTING Star Design's request for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/6/2019. (bak) Modified on 6/6/2019 (dkd).
June 4, 2019 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2019 re 12 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Seizure Order filed by Star Design International Inc. Sandra Wunderlich and Scott Hunsaker appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Defendants did not appear. The Court intends to modify the original Seizure Order. The Court also GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 12) and ORDERS that Doc. 27 is unsealed. Plaintiff is ORDERED to return all wrongfully seized items to defendants within seven (7) days. Order to issue. (Court Reporter Molly Clayton.) (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 30, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Star Design International Inc.. Hussein J. Nijmeh served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 30, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Star Design International Inc.. Mohammad N. Farah served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 30, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Star Design International Inc.. Sandro Y. Nijmeh served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 30, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Star Design International Inc.. E & Mackeen Grocery, Inc. served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 30, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Star Design International Inc.. Banduk Inc. served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 30, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Star Design International Inc.. Pali 1948 LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 30, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Star Design International Inc.. Hasuon, Inc. served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 30, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Star Design International Inc.. Jacobo Inc. served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING in part 12 Sealed Ex Parte Motion. The Court SETS a hearing for June 4, 2019 at 2:30 PM. See Order for specifics and all other deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/20/2019. (drb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Hussein J. Nijmeh and original mailed to Attorney Wunderlich. (kdb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Mohammad N. Farah and original mailed to Attorney Wunderlich. (kdb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Sandro Y. Nijmeh and original mailed to Attorney Wunderlich. (kdb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to E & Mackeen Grocery, Inc., and original mailed to Attorney Wunderlich. (kdb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Banduk Inc., and original mailed to Attorney Wunderlich. (kdb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Pali 1948 LLC., and original mailed to Attorney Wunderlich. (kdb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Hasuon, Inc., and original mailed to Attorney Wunderlich. (kdb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Jacobo Inc., and original mailed to Attorney Wunderlich. (kdb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 AO 120 Report of Filing. (kdb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra J. Wunderlich on behalf of Star Design International Inc. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by Star Design International Inc. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Wunderlich does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. Parties were not named per the Court's naming standards. Please refer to our website instructions for searching and adding parties> electronic Case Filing> training resources. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-518-NJR-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kdb)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R. Hunsaker on behalf of Star Design International Inc. (Hunsaker, Scott)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Requested. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Requested. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Requested. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Requested. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Star Design International Inc.. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT by Star Design International Inc.. Exhibit to #1 Complaint : Civil Cover Sheet. (Wunderlich, Sandra)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3882833.), filed by Star Design International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Wunderlich, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Star Design International Inc. v. Jacobo, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandro Y. Nijmeh
Represented By: J. Joseph Muller
Represented By: David L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pali 1948 LLC, d/b/a POP'S #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E & Mackeen Grocery, Inc., d/b/a POP'S #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hussein J. Nijmeh
Represented By: J. Joseph Muller
Represented By: David L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasuon, Inc., d/b/a POP'S #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad N. Farah
Represented By: J. Joseph Muller
Represented By: David L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobo, Inc., d/b/a Pop's Convenience Store or POP'S #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banduk Inc., d/b/a POP'S #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobo Inc.
Represented By: J. Joseph Muller
Represented By: David L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasuon, Inc.
Represented By: J. Joseph Muller
Represented By: David L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pali 1948 LLC
Represented By: J. Joseph Muller
Represented By: David L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banduk Inc.
Represented By: J. Joseph Muller
Represented By: David L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E & Mackeen Grocery, Inc.
Represented By: J. Joseph Muller
Represented By: David L. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Star Design International Inc.
Represented By: Sandra J. Wunderlich
Represented By: Scott R. Hunsaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?