USA v. $47,000 in United States currency et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $47,000 in United States currency and One 2017 Toyota Tundra
Interested Party: Jessica Stringer
Claimant: William Lee Manns
Case Number: 3:2019cv00551
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #10 Claim and for Judgment of Default by USA. (Hanna, Adam)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #10 Claim filed by William Lee Manns. Docket text modified to reflect the correct filer of the document, William Lee Manns. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil J. Bruntrager on behalf of William L Manns (Bruntrager, Neil)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM Claim for Assets by William Lee Manns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claim for Assets)(Bruntrager, Neil) Modified on 7/22/2019 (cjo).
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Interest in Forfeiture by Jessica Stringer. (kek) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2019: #1 Envelope) (kek).
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by USA on 06/19/2019. (Hanna, Adam)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 Warrant for Arrest of Articles of REM for $47,000.00 In United States Currency. (kdb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Warrant for Arrest of Articles of REM for 2017 Toyota Tundra. (kdb)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by USA re #1 Complaint (Direct Notice of Civil Judicial Forfeiture) (Hanna, Adam)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-551-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(trb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of United States (Hanna, Adam)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against $47,000 in United States currency, One 2017 Toyota Tundra, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $47,000 in United States currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $47,000 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2017 Toyota Tundra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jessica Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: William Lee Manns
Represented By: Neil J. Bruntrager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?