Paddick v. USA et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca S. Paddick
Defendant: Aristides Garces, M.D., Amy McLean, FNP-C, United States of America, Southern Illinois Healthcare Foundation Inc, Amy McLean, Aristides Garces and USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00636
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #12 Summons Returned Executed filed by Rebecca S. Paddick and #13 Summons Returned Executed filed by Rebecca S. Paddick. Docket text has been modified to reflect the correct service execution date, 06/27/2019, and updated answer due deadline, 07/18/2019. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca S. Paddick. Amy McLean served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Short, D.) Modified on 7/10/2019 (cjo).
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca S. Paddick. Aristides Garces served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Short, D.) Modified on 7/10/2019 (cjo).
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca S. Paddick. Southern Illinois Healthcare Foundation Inc served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Short, D.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Southern Illinois Healthcare Foundation Inc., Aristides Garces, Amy McLean. (cjo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to USA. (cjo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Requested. (Short, D.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Short, D.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested. (Short, D.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested. (Short, D.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-636-SMY-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(cjo)
June 13, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0754-3903368. (cjo)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Attorney by Rebecca S. Paddick. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Short, D.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Keith Short on behalf of Rebecca S. Paddick (Short, D.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rebecca S. Paddick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cvr Sheet)(Short, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paddick v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristides Garces, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy McLean, FNP-C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Illinois Healthcare Foundation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristides Garces
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca S. Paddick
Represented By: D. Keith Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?