Woody v. David Stanley Consultants, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shaun Woody
Defendant: David Stanley Consultants, LLC, The American Coal Company and American Coal Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00639
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to The American Coal Company, filed by Shaun Woody. (Cates, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shaun Woody. David Stanley Consultants, LLC waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Cates, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Coal Company identifying Corporate Parent AmCoal Holdings, Inc. for American Coal Company. (Kuehnel, Sarah)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 AMERICAN COAL COMPANY'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by American Coal Company.(Kuehnel, Sarah)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Jean Kuehnel on behalf of All Defendants (Kuehnel, Sarah)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mallory Stumpf Zoia on behalf of All Defendants (Zoia, Mallory)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Lance Witcher on behalf of All Defendants (Witcher, R.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to American Coal Company, David Stanley Consultants, LLC. and returned to attorney for service. (trb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT by Shaun Woody. Exhibit to #1 Complaint . (Cates, David)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-639-NJR-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(trb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ACTION: The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Michael Mooney on behalf of Shaun Woody (Mooney, Chad)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested. (Cates, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested. (Cates, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David I. Cates on behalf of Shaun Woody (Cates, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3904136.), filed by Shaun Woody.(Cates, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woody v. David Stanley Consultants, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stanley Consultants, LLC
Represented By: R. Lance Witcher
Represented By: Sarah Jean Kuehnel
Represented By: Mallory Stumpf Zoia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Coal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Coal Company
Represented By: R. Lance Witcher
Represented By: Sarah Jean Kuehnel
Represented By: Mallory Stumpf Zoia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Woody
Represented By: Chad Michael Mooney
Represented By: David I. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?