Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds v. A&A Hauling, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds
Defendant: A&A Hauling, Inc. and Steven R Petroff
Case Number: 3:2019cv00640
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds. Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Kelly, Chet)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kelly, Chet)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay AND COMPEL ARBITRATION by A&A Hauling, Inc.. (Maag, Thomas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Steven R Petroff. Responses due by 8/12/2019 (Maag, Thomas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Maag on behalf of All Defendants (Maag, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kelly, Chet)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Steven R Petroff and original mailed to Attorney Kelly. (kdb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to A&A Hauling, Inc. and original mailed to Attorney Kelly. (kdb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-640-SMY-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Chet A Kelly on behalf of Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds (Kelly, Chet)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3904231.), filed by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Kelly, Chet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds v. A&A Hauling, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&A Hauling, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. Maag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R Petroff
Represented By: Thomas G. Maag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds
Represented By: Chet A Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?