Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds v. Groundworks Contracting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds
Defendant: Groundworks Contracting, Inc. and Jason Richter
Case Number: 3:2019cv00641
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Groundworks Contracting, Inc., and Jason Richter, Granting #8 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds.(kdb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Kelly, Chet)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds. Jason Richter served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Kelly, Chet)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds. Groundworks Contracting, Inc. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Kelly, Chet)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kelly, Chet)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Groundworks Contracting, Inc., Jason Richter and returned to attorney for service. (trb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-641-SMY-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(trb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Chet A Kelly on behalf of Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds (Kelly, Chet)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3904253.), filed by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Kelly, Chet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds v. Groundworks Contracting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groundworks Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health & Welfare and Annuity Funds
Represented By: Chet A Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?