Caito Foods, LLC v. Norrenberns Foods Inc et al
Plaintiff: Caito Foods, LLC
Defendant: Donald T. Norrenberns, Norrenberns Foods Inc and John B. Norrenberns
Case Number: 3:2019cv00654
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0654. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 7/31/2019. (dmw2)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:30 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Bench Trial month set for November, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(drb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Wallace on behalf of All Defendants (Wallace, Steven)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants.(Wallace, Steven)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caito Foods, LLC. John B. Norrenberns served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Kyser, Eric)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caito Foods, LLC. Donald T. Norrenberns served on 6/30/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Kyser, Eric)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caito Foods, LLC. Norrenberns Foods Inc served on 6/30/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Kyser, Eric)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M. Kyser on behalf of Caito Foods, LLC (Kyser, Eric)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to John B. Norrenberns. Original mailed to Plaintiff for service. (amv)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Donald T. Norrenberns. Original mailed to Plaintiff for service. (amv)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Norrenberns Foods Inc. Original mailed to Plaintiff for service (amv)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-654-NJR-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caito Foods, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SpartanNash Company for Caito Foods, LLC. (Kyser, Eric)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald T. Norrenberns, John B. Norrenberns, Norrenberns Foods Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3906453.), filed by Caito Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statements of Account and Unpaid Invoices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Norrenberns Foods, Inc., #4 Summons Donald T. Norrenberns, #5 Summons John B. Norrenberns)(Kyser, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caito Foods, LLC v. Norrenberns Foods Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald T. Norrenberns
Represented By: Steven M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norrenberns Foods Inc
Represented By: Steven M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B. Norrenberns
Represented By: Steven M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caito Foods, LLC
Represented By: Eric M. Kyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?