United States v. $18,340.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States and USA
Defendant: $18,340.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2019cv00657
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by USA on 07/11/2019. (Hanna, Adam)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 0098. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 8/6/2019. (arf)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 CJRA TRACK A assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/22/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Bench Trial date of 5/4/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benedict Y. Song on behalf of $18,340.00 in United States Currency (Song, Benedict)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 CLAIM Amended by $18,340.00 in United States Currency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Song, Benedict)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 CLAIM by $18,340.00 in United States Currency. (Song, Benedict)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem Issued as to $18,340.00 in United States Currency (amv)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States re #2 Complaint (Direct Notice of Civil Judicial Forfeiture) (Hanna, Adam)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-657-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent brochure)(cds)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against $18,340.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of United States (Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. $18,340.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $18,340.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Benedict Y. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?