Whigham v. Stewart
Plaintiff: Anita Whigham and Anita J. Whigham
Defendant: Joyce Stewart
Case Number: 3:2019cv00690
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims, or in the Alternative,, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Joyce Stewart. Responses due by 8/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wyatt, Nathan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Wyatt, Nathan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBIT by Joyce Stewart. Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, (Civil Cover Sheet). (Wyatt, Nathan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Notice of Removal. A Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event "Exhibit" located under Civil > Other Documents. The filing should be linked back to the #1 Notice of Removal docket entry. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-690-SMY-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Joyce Stewart-Borders With Prejudice and Substitute The United States of America by Joyce Stewart. Responses due by 7/29/2019 (Wyatt, Nathan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan E. Wyatt on behalf of Joyce Stewart (Wyatt, Nathan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit, St. Clair County, case number 19-AR-0289, filed by Joyce Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Wyatt, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whigham v. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Whigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita J. Whigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Stewart
Represented By: Nathan E. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?