Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health, Welfare and Annuity Funds v. Ehret, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health, Welfare and Annuity Funds
Defendant: Mark Ehret and Ehret, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00715
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Mark Ehret and Ehret, Inc. Plaintiff does not object to the Motion. The Clerk's Entry of Default is VACATED. Defendants Mark Ehret and Ehret, Inc. answers due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/27/2019. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER upon consent of parties, this case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly for final disposition. Judge Staci M. Yandle no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/26/2019. (rah)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mark Ehret, Ehret, Inc.. (Lammert, Andrew)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Lammert, Andrew) Unsealed on 8/21/2019 (rah).
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Set Aside Default by All Defendants. (Lammert, Andrew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Lammert on behalf of Mark Ehret, Ehret, Inc. (Lammert, Andrew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 VACATED PER ORDER AT DOC. 16 - Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mark Ehret and Ehret, Inc. (rah) Modified on 8/28/2019 (rah).
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health, Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Kelly, Chet)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health, Welfare and Annuity Funds. Mark Ehret served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Kelly, Chet)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health, Welfare and Annuity Funds. Ehret, Inc. served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Kelly, Chet)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kelly, Chet) Unsealed on 8/21/2019 (rah).
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mark Ehret. Original mailed to Plaintiff for service. (amv)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ehret, Inc. Original mailed to Plaintiff for service. (amv)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-715-SMY-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Chet A Kelly on behalf of Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health, Welfare and Annuity Funds (Kelly, Chet)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3920100.), filed by Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health, Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Kelly, Chet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health, Welfare and Annuity Funds v. Ehret, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers & Laborers Locals 100 & 397 Pension, Health, Welfare and Annuity Funds
Represented By: Chet A Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ehret
Represented By: Andrew M. Lammert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ehret, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Lammert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?