Vandervelden v. USA
Plaintiff: Lisa Vandervelden
Defendant: The United States of America and USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00746
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by USA. Responses due by 10/10/2019 (Garrison, Suzanne)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of USA (Garrison, Suzanne)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Lisa Vandervelden Notice of Motion to Consolidate (Keefe, Thomas)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Vandervelden. USA served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Keefe, Thomas)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/19/2019. (jdh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to USA. (cjo)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-746-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(cjo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested. (Keefe, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Q. Keefe, Jr on behalf of Lisa Vandervelden (Keefe, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3925112.), filed by Lisa Vandervelden. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit ATTY AFFIDAVIT & COM, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Keefe, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vandervelden v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Vandervelden
Represented By: Thomas Q. Keefe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?