Mcconnell v. Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC
Plaintiff: Kendall Mcconnell
Defendant: Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00755
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Settlement statements due on or before 2/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 9/5/2019. (dmw2)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery due by 4/8/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(dmw2)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/5/2019. Attorney Linda Cantrell present on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorneys Brad Tharpe and James Paul present on behalf of Defendant. The Joint Report of the Parties will be adopted. Should the parties seek to amend the trial date, a written motion will be required. The parties are reminded of the option of consenting to the magistrate judge. A Settlement Conference is set for 3/2/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. (dmw2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joshua S. Owings terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 9/3/2019. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC. (Owings, Joshua)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Walker Tharpe on behalf of Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC (Tharpe, Bradley)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Responsive Pleadings Out of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 8/5/2019. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC.(Owings, Joshua)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleadings Out of Time by Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC. (Owings, Joshua)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0755. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 8/2/2019. (dmw2)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/19/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 8/31/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC. (Owings, Joshua)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal (executed) (Owings, Joshua)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-755-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(cjo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Paul on behalf of Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC (Paul, James)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, to Parties (Owings, Joshua)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Owings on behalf of Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC (Owings, Joshua)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Williamson County IL, case number 2019L81 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3926935), filed by Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Owings, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mcconnell v. Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aisin MFG. Illinois, LLC
Represented By: James M. Paul
Represented By: Joshua S. Owings
Represented By: Bradley Walker Tharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Mcconnell
Represented By: Jay Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?