Harris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Angela Harris
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00776
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Harris. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. (cjo)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) Modified and Unsealed on 7/31/2019 (cjo).
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (cjo)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Van Fossan, Kristen) Unsealed on 7/31/2019 (cjo).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Angela Harris. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/19/2019. (jdh)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen N. Van Fossan on behalf of Angela Harris (Van Fossan, Kristen)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ACTION: See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this Court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the Court. Attorney Van Fossan does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kls3)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:19-cv-776-JPG-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(kls3)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela Harris. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Angela Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Andrew Saul, #3 Summons William Barr, #4 Summons Steven Weinhoeft)(Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Harris
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?