Finite Resources, Ltd. et al v. DTE Methane Resources , LLC et al
Plaintiff: Finite Resources, Ltd., Southern Cross Energy, LLC and Durango Group, Inc.
Defendant: DTE Methane Resources, LLC and Keyrock Energy LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00802
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0802. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 8/29/2019. (dmw2)
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Illingworth on behalf of Finite Resources, Ltd. (Illingworth, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 1:30 PM and Bench Trial set for 10/26/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(slh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 1st AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Keyrock Energy LLC.(Rhine, John)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, James)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James Darrell Johnson on behalf of Durango Group, Inc., Finite Resources, Ltd., Southern Cross Energy, LLC (Johnson, James)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keyrock Energy LLC identifying Other Affiliate KEHC, LLC for Keyrock Energy LLC. (Murphy, G.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DTE Methane Resources, LLC identifying Corporate Parent DTE Biomass, Inc., Corporate Parent DTE Coal Services, Inc. for DTE Methane Resources, LLC. (Riddle, Benjamin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by DTE Methane Resources, LLC. Corporate parents were not added to the case. Document to be re-filed. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Virgil Brandon McGrath on behalf of Keyrock Energy LLC (McGrath, Virgil)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin L. Riddle on behalf of DTE Methane Resources, LLC (Riddle, Benjamin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 STRICKEN - Corporate Disclosure Statement by DTE Methane Resources, LLC. (Riddle, Benjamin) Modified on 8/2/2019 (cjo).
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by DTE Methane Resources, LLC.(Riddle, Benjamin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Keyrock Energy LLC.(Rhine, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Rhine on behalf of Keyrock Energy LLC (Rhine, John)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty recused. Case referral reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 7/26/2019. (arf)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel recused. Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 7/26/2019. (drb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from USDC-SDIL to Attorney William C. Illingworth regarding admission to our court. Original mailed to Attorney Illingworth. (lmb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-802-NJR-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(lmb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Patrick Murphy on behalf of Keyrock Energy LLC (Murphy, G.)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County, Illinois, case number 2019-L-39 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3936999), filed by Keyrock Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 EX 01, #3 EX 02, #4 EX 03, #5 EX 04, #6 EX 05, #7 EX 06, #8 EX 07, #9 EX 08, #10 EX 09, #11 EX 10, #12 EX 11)(Murphy, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finite Resources, Ltd. et al v. DTE Methane Resources , LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTE Methane Resources, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin L. Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keyrock Energy LLC
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Represented By: Virgil Brandon McGrath
Represented By: John E. Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finite Resources, Ltd.
Represented By: William C. Illingworth
Represented By: James Darrell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Cross Energy, LLC
Represented By: William C. Illingworth
Represented By: James Darrell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durango Group, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Illingworth
Represented By: James Darrell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?