USA v. Wilson
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Wesley T. Wilson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00827
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/30/2019. (bak)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) provides that a plaintiff may dismiss an action without a court order by filing a notice of dismissal before the opposing party files an answer or summary judgment motion. On August 29, 2019, plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice, prior to the opposing party filing an answer or summary judgment motion. The notice effected the immediate dismissal of the suit. The clerk's office shall enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/30/2019. (bak)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by USA (Hanna, Adam)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Wesley T. Wilson waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Hanna, Adam)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-827-NJR-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(lmb)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of USA (Hanna, Adam)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE by USA (Hanna, Adam)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wesley T. Wilson, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?