USA v. McDuffie et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Timothy M. McDuffie, Tabitha D. McDuffie and Meadowbrook Public Water District
Case Number: 3:2019cv00833
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Tabitha D. McDuffie served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019; Meadowbrook Public Water District served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Hanna, Adam)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Tabitha D. McDuffie and sent to USM per U.S. Attorneys request. (trb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Meadowbrook Public Water District and sent to USM per request of the U.S. Attorneys Office. (trb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Timothy M. McDuffie waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Hanna, Adam)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:19-cv-833-NJR-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(kls3)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of USA (Hanna, Adam)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE by USA (Hanna, Adam)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tabitha D. McDuffie, Timothy M. McDuffie, Meadowbrook Public Water District, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. McDuffie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M. McDuffie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabitha D. McDuffie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadowbrook Public Water District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?