Johnson v. Menasha Packaging Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lennil L. Johnson, Jr. and Lennil Johnson
Defendant: Menasha Corporation and Menasha Packaging Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00835
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Menasha Corporation, Menasha Packaging Company, LLC. Defendants Menasha Corporation and Menasha Packaging Company, LLC answers due 10/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 9/20/2019. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Metcalf, Andrew)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lennil Johnson. Menasha Corporation served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Szewczyk, Edward)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Szewczyk, Jr on behalf of Lennil Johnson (Szewczyk, Edward)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, ortransferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Szewczyk does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Menasha Corporation, Menasha Packaging Company, LLC. (rah)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-835-SMY-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Brochure)(rah)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3943546.), filed by Lennil Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Szewczyk, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Menasha Packaging Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennil L. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Edward J. Szewczyk, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lennil Johnson
Represented By: Edward J. Szewczyk, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menasha Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Laird Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menasha Packaging Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Laird Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?