White v. Madison County Court
Petitioner: Tony White
Respondent: Madison County Court
Case Number: 3:2019cv00841
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 DOCKET ANNOTATION - Scanning Graham added this date for receipt of electronic transmissions. (jsm2)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Tony White.(jaj)
September 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Action due by 9/12/2019. (jaj)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: White was ordered to notify the Court by August 21, 2019, whether he intended to file his petition as a writ of mandamus or as some other claim for relief. (Doc. 3). Instead of notifying the Court of the type of claim he intended to bring, on August 21, 2019, White filed an IFP Motion. (Doc. 4). White must inform the Court on or before September 12, 2019, of what type of claim he intends to bring. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of the action for want of prosecution and/or failure to comply with a court order. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/29/2019. (jrj)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jsm2)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony White. (jsm2)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: On August 2, 2019, Petitioner White filed with the Court a document labeled "Petition to Order Circuit Court to Compel Record and Discovery," which was docketed as a Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (Doc. #1 ). As White did not prepay the filing fee for this action or file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP Motion") and because he requests the Court to order the production of state court documents and alleges due process violations and sabotage during his criminal trial, it is unclear what type of action White intends to bring. Different claims may have different consequences, including the filing fee associate with the claim (presently $400.00), see Bunn v. Conley, 309 F.3d 1002, 1007 (7th Cir. 2002), and so White is hereby ORDERED to notify this Court in writing on or before August 21, 2019, whether he intended to file Doc. #1 as petition for a writ of mandamus or as some other claim for relief. If White did not intend to commence a new action in this Court, he is ORDERED to notify the Court of this fact in writing by the same deadline (on or before August 21, 2019) and request voluntary dismissal of this case. If he files a motion for voluntary dismissal of this action on or before the deadline, the Court will waive the filing fee associated with this action. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order and/or for failure to prosecute his claims. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b).( Action due by 8/21/2019.). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/6/2019. (jrj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Petitioner advising of case number. (Attachments: #1 Consent, #2 Motion for IFP). (jsm2)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Tony White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope).(jsm2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Madison County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tony White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Madison County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?