Schwartz v. NRG Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Andrew Schwartz
Defendant: NRG Media, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00909
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 8829. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/27/2019. (arf)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Jury Trial month set for January, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(drb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by NRG Media, LLC.(Lieber, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NRG Media, LLC. (Lieber, Michael)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Lieber on behalf of NRG Media, LLC (Lieber, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Schwartz. NRG Media, LLC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to NRG Media, LLC. (cjo)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Liebowitz on behalf of Andrew Schwartz (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 AO-121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (cjo)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Liebowitz does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-909-NJR-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(cjo)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NRG Media, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3958437.), filed by Andrew Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwartz v. NRG Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRG Media, LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Schwartz
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?