Eye Physicians of St. Louis, Inc. v. Vision for Life, Ltd.
Plaintiff: EYE PHYSICIANS OF ST. LOUIS, INC.
Defendant: VISION FOR LIFE, LTD., and Vision for Life, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00950
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 3:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days before the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions for joining the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 8871. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 10/28/2019. (arf)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/14/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Bench Trial date of 10/26/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. (tag)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vision for Life, Ltd.. (Weder, David)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Bridget G. Hoy. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bridget G. Hoy $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3996388 by on behalf of Vision for Life, Ltd.. (Hoy, Bridget)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eye Physicians of St. Louis, Inc.. Vision for Life, Ltd. waiver sent on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Grady, Randall)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Weder on behalf of Vision for Life, Ltd. (Weder, David)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Grady, Randall)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall D. Grady on behalf of EYE PHYSICIANS OF ST. LOUIS, INC. (Grady, Randall)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to VISION FOR LIFE, LTD. and original mailed to Attorney Grady. (kek)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 Report of Filing (kek)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Grady does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-950-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EYE PHYSICIANS OF ST. LOUIS, INC.. (Grady, Randall)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VISION FOR LIFE, LTD., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3965991.), filed by EYE PHYSICIANS OF ST. LOUIS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration Certificate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Grady, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eye Physicians of St. Louis, Inc. v. Vision for Life, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EYE PHYSICIANS OF ST. LOUIS, INC.
Represented By: Randall D. Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISION FOR LIFE, LTD.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision for Life, Ltd.
Represented By: David A. Weder
Represented By: Bridget G. Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?