McCammon N v. Bradford Supply Company
Plaintiff: Carl L. McCammon
Defendant: Bradford Supply Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00980
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING #11 Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Bradford Supply Company. On September 9, 2019, this case was randomly assigned to the undersigned Chief District Judge, who is located in the East St. Louis Courthouse (Doc. 3). See SDIL-LR 40.1. Defendant now asks the Court to transfer this case to the Benton division of the Southern District of Illinois under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). That statute permits a district court to transfer a civil action to "any other district or division where it might have been brought" for the convenience of parties and witnesses. 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). There is, however, only one division in the Southern District of Illinois. 28 U.S.C. 93. "Benton is not, in fact, a division of the Southern District of Illinois separate and apart from the federal district courthouse located in East Saint Louis, Illinois (where this case has been assigned)." Craig v. Harrah's Entm't, Inc., 2006 WL 1004931 *1 (S.D. Ill. Apr. 13, 2006). Because there is no other division in the Southern District of Illinois in which this case might have been brought, Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (Doc. #11 ) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/7/2019. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin T.M. McLaughlin on behalf of Bradford Supply Company (McLaughlin, Kristin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Glass on behalf of Bradford Supply Company (Glass, Adam)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #13 Objection filed by Carl L. McCammon. Incorrect filing event chosen. In order to properly create a document association to the Motion, filer should have used the event "Response to Motion" located under Civil > Motions and Related Filings > Memoranda in Support, Responses and Replies. Docket text has been modified as follows: Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Transfer Venue. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Transfer Venue. (Kondras, Jr., Robert) Modified on 10/4/2019 (kek).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER finding as moot #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 10/1/2019. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Bradford Supply Company. (Glass, Danny)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Bradford Supply Company.(Glass, Danny)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bradford Supply Company. (Glass, Danny)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Bradford Supply Company. Document attached is a proposed order. Proposed orders are not to be filed, rather they should be submitted via email to the appropriate Judge. Proposed order to be deleted in accordance with this Court's practices and should be submitted accordingly. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bradford Supply Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Initial Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Glass, Danny)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny E. Glass on behalf of Bradford Supply Company (Glass, Danny)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl L. McCammon. Bradford Supply Company served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Kondras, Jr., Robert)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bradford Supply Company and original mailed to Attorney Kondras. (kek)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-980-NJR-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Kondras, Jr. on behalf of CARL L. MCCAMMON (Kondras, Jr., Robert)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRADFORD SUPPLY COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3970461.), filed by CARL L. MCCAMMON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kondras, Jr., Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCammon N v. Bradford Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford Supply Company
Represented By: Adam S. Glass
Represented By: Danny E. Glass
Represented By: Kristin T.M. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl L. McCammon
Represented By: Robert P. Kondras, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?