Agin v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Cathy Agin
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00983
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott R. Seideman on behalf of Plaintiff Cathy Agin. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott R. Seideman $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3995437 by on behalf of Cathy Agin. (Seideman, Scott)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable document 6 sent to Attorney Scott Seideman. (trb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ostfeld, Gregory)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. The Court construes this motion as a combined motion to withdraw and notice of appearance by Gregory E. Ostfeld on behalf of Defendant Bard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 9/12/2019. (jer)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney -UnOpposed Motion to Record Withdrawals and Appearance Following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ostfeld, Gregory)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to Attorneys of Record regarding case transfer (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (rah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03242. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 6, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of Illinois via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/6/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/6/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/6/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-3242-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/6/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 097-16930169 filed by Cathy Agin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agin v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory E. Ostfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory E. Ostfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Agin
Represented By: Scott R Seideman
Represented By: Scott R. Seideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?