Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Robin Jackson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00987
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/7/2019. (jmt)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robin Jackson. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/1/2019. (jdh)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robin Jackson. (amv)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: doc. 4 Motion for Leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by plaintiff Robin Jackson. The Court is unable to determine pauperis status at this time as the form is incomplete. Specifically, question 3 of the form is a multiple part question and Plaintiff did not answer all the parts. Plaintiff also left questions 4 through 8 blank. Form must be filled out in its entirety. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Amended motion due on or before October 1, 2019. Failure to do so may result in denial of the original motion. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/16/2019. (jdh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel filed by Robin Jackson. (cjo)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robin Jackson. (cjo)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Sealed Personal ID Page. (cjo)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Robin Jackson.(cjo)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-987-JPG-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (cjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?