Culley v. Renal Life Link, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Culley
Defendant: Renal Life Link, Inc. d/b/a DaVita Metro East Dialysis d/b/a Metro East Dialysis, DaVita Incorporated and Renal Life Link, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00990
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/16/2019. (jdh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(2) by Jacqueline Culley. Responses due by 11/18/2019 (Cueto, Lloyd)
October 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lloyd M. Cueto on behalf of Jacqueline Culley (Cueto, Lloyd)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Cueto does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #2 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due 11/12/2019. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/11/2019. (tlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss by Jacqueline Culley. (Cueto, Lloyd)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Report of Parties is approved and entered. Discovery to be completed by 6/8/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(jlm)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly: Scheduling and Discovery Conference held on 10/7/2019. Attorney Lloyd Cueto for Plaintiff and Attorney William Thomas for Defendants. The Joint Report of Parties is approved and will be entered. Status Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 10:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: Disputes which require a ruling on a motion made under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be handled in the following manner. The party seeking a discovery order shall request a prompt telephone conference with Judge Daly and opposing counsel by alerting the law clerk assigned to the case and providing the law clerk with appropriate material, such as: (1) a list or summary of the items in dispute, (2) copies of written requests/objections/privilege logs in dispute, and (3) an estimate of the amount of time needed to present argument to the Court. Law clerks prefer to receive these materials through Judge Daly's email depository for proposed documents. Prior to seeking a telephone conference with Judge Daly, the parties must meet and confer in an attempt to resolve the dispute informally. Argument on motions to compel discovery or for discovery sanctions shall be presented orally at the telephone conference. Written motions or legal memoranda will not be accepted unless specifically requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 9/13/2019. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 11:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call Judge Daly's conference line at 618-439-7731. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the conference call.(jlm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/14/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 10/26/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DaVita Incorporated. (Thomas, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Renal Life Link, Inc. d/b/a DaVita Metro East Dialysis d/b/a Metro East Dialysis identifying Corporate Parent DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc., Corporate Parent Renal Life Link, Inc. d/b/a DaVita Metro East Dialysis d/b/a Metro East Dialysis for Renal Life Link, Inc. d/b/a DaVita Metro East Dialysis d/b/a Metro East Dialysis. (Thomas, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Notice of Removal. Attachments to Notice of Removal include Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statements. These documents should be separately re-filed as to each Defendant. The filer should use the event "Corporate Disclosure Statement" located under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents, and should add any Corporate Parents upon filing. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-990-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Thomas on behalf of All Defendants (Thomas, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (Thomas, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, case number 19-L-0511, filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil CoveR Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint State Court Complaint, #3 Supplement Discl of Corp Interests - DaVita, #4 Supplement Discl of Corp Interests - Renal, #5 Supplement Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Thomas, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culley v. Renal Life Link, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renal Life Link, Inc. d/b/a DaVita Metro East Dialysis d/b/a Metro East Dialysis
Represented By: William S. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DaVita Incorporated
Represented By: William S. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renal Life Link, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Culley
Represented By: Lloyd M. Cueto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?