Hewitt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sharon L. Hewitt
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00997
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. (cds)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) Modified on 9/26/2019 (cds).
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Original mailed to Attorney Traci L. Severs (lmb)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sharon L. Hewitt. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/16/2019. (jdh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Severs, Traci)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-997-JPG-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (cds)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sharon L. Hewitt. (Severs, Traci)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Traci L. Severs on behalf of Sharon L. Hewitt (Severs, Traci)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Sharon L. Hewitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Andrew M. Saul)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewitt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon L. Hewitt
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?