Jackson v. East Saint Louis Board of Education District 189, et al
Plaintiff: Yvette Jackson and Yvette L. Jackson
Defendant: East Saint Louis Board of Education District 189 and Arthur R. Culver
Case Number: 3:2019cv01030
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Adam Hoerner on behalf of Arthur R. Culver, East Saint Louis Board of Education District 189 (Hoerner, Timothy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Arthur R. Culver, East Saint Louis Board of Education District 189. Responses due by 12/9/2019 (Hoerner, Garrett)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Arthur R. Culver, East Saint Louis Board of Education District 189. (Hoerner, Garrett)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett P. Hoerner on behalf of Arthur R. Culver, East Saint Louis Board of Education District 189 (Hoerner, Garrett)
October 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Brock-Moore on behalf of Yvette L. Jackson (Brock-Moore, Dedra)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Arthur R. Culver and original mailed to Attorney Fields. (kek)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to East Saint Louis Board of Education District 189 and original mailed to Attorney Fields. (kek)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBIT by Yvette L. Jackson. Exhibit to #1 Complaint, . (Fields, Larry)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #13 Amended Complaint filed by Yvette L. Jackson. The Civil Cover Sheet remains incorrectly filed. Attorney Fields or his e-filer should contact the Clerk's Office at (618) 439-7760 for a walk through of docketing the Civil Cover Sheet, at his earliest convenience. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 STRICKEN - AMENDED COMPLAINT against Yvette L. Jackson, filed by Yvette L. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Fields, Larry) Modified on 9/25/2019 (kek).
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Fields, Larry)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Fields, Larry)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Requested. (Fields, Larry)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #8 Amended Document filed by Yvette L. Jackson. Incorrect filing event used. Filer should have used the event "Notice of Appearance" located under Civil > Other Filings > Notices. Docket text has been modified accordingly. No further action is required by the filer in relation to the filing of Notice of Appearance. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Larry Fields on behalf of Yvette L. Jackson. (Fields, Larry) Modified on 9/23/2019 (kek).
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #5 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Yvette L. Jackson, #6 Summons Requested. Filer has reattached the original Complaint along with the civil cover sheet and filed as a Motion to Amend. As indicated in the Notice at Document 4, the civil cover sheet (as a sole document, not with an accompanying Complaint) should be filed using the event "Exhibit" found under Civil > Other Documents and linked back to the Complaint at Document #1 . The summons requested is directed to both defendants on one form. Filer should re-file summonses requested as two separate forms, still filed in the same docket entry. Filer should ensure the summons forms are completed in their entirety including Counsel's service information. Counsel is also reminded to file a Notice of Appearance in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 STRICKEN - Summons Requested. (Fields, Larry) Modified on 9/23/2019 (kek).
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 STRICKEN - MOTION to Amend/Correct by Yvette L. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Fields, Larry) Modified on 9/23/2019 (kek).
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Fields does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event Exhibit found under Civil > Other Documents and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Yvette Jackson. Parties were incorrectly added to the case. Plaintiff was added without the middle initial and Defendant Culver was omitted completely. Party names have been modified on the docket sheet accordingly. In addition, the Complaint at Document #1 was filed against the Plaintiff, rather than against the Defendant. Docket text has been modified as follows: COMPLAINT against East Saint Louis Board of Education District 189 and Arthur R. Culver. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1030-SMY-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against East Saint Louis Board of Education District 189 and Arthur R. Culver ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3982718.), filed by Yvette Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter-EEOC)(Fields, Larry) Modified on 9/23/2019 (kek).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. East Saint Louis Board of Education District 189, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Saint Louis Board of Education District 189
Represented By: Garrett P. Hoerner
Represented By: Timothy Adam Hoerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur R. Culver
Represented By: Garrett P. Hoerner
Represented By: Timothy Adam Hoerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Jackson
Represented By: Larry S. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette L. Jackson
Represented By: Larry S. Fields
Represented By: Dedra Brock-Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?