Clemons v. Kraft Heinz Foods Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Clemons
Defendant: Capri Sun, Inc. and Kraft Heinz Foods Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01072
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, effective immediately, this case will no longer be referred to a Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Should the parties elect to consent to have the Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this matter, the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form shall be filed within 14 days of this Order or before the deadline for filing dispositive motions, whichever is later. Consents filed after this deadline may not be accepted by the District Judge. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is included for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to case. All future documents must bear case number 19-1072-JPG. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/22/2019. (jaj)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brenda Clemons. Capri Sun, Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Miller, Joshua)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brenda Clemons. Kraft Heinz Foods Company, LLC waiver sent on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Miller, Joshua)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Furniss on behalf of Brenda Clemons (Furniss, Ryan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Capri Sun, Inc on 10/9/2019 by Brenda Clemons. Waiver of Service due by 11/8/2019. (Miller, Joshua)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kraft Heinz Foods Company, LLC on 10/9/2019 by Brenda Clemons. Waiver of Service due by 11/8/2019. (Miller, Joshua)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:19-cv-1072-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kls3)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua G. Miller on behalf of Brenda Clemons (Miller, Joshua)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3992027.), filed by Brenda Clemons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemons v. Kraft Heinz Foods Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capri Sun, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Foods Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Clemons
Represented By: Joshua G. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?